Echlin, Paul Sean (CPSO#: 83621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Elliott Sports Medicine Clinic
Suite 102
1100 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7N 2G3
Phone: (905) 336-3340
Fax: (905) 336-6095
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL SEAN ECHLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ECHLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Jul 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2007