Eder, Lihi (CPSO#: 88185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  31 Dec 2022

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Department of Rheumatology
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: (416) 323-6344 Ext. 5108
Fax: (416) 323-6115
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eder Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Eder ( CPSO# 88185 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
Department of Rheumatology
76 Grenville Street
6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (614) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 01 Jan 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 10 Jun 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jan 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Lihi Eder may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Rheumatology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Eder
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Eder  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Eder's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Eder's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on January 1, 2016.  In accordance with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on December 31, 2022.