Edgar, Allison Catherine (CPSO#: 88791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Collingwood General
and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone: (705) 445-2550 Ext. 8617
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

GHBS Markdale Hospital
P.O. Box 406
55 Isla Street
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0
Canada
Phone: (519) 986-3040
County: County of Grey
Electoral District: 03

Hume Street Dental Care
304 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W1
Canada
Phone: (705) 445-2281
Fax: (705) 445-2285
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.C. Edgar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Edgar ( CPSO# 88791 )

Business Address:
Collingwood General
and Marine Hospital
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
GHBS Markdale Hospital
55 Isla Street
Markdale ON  N0C 1H0
Phone Number: (519) 986-3040

Business Address:
304 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W1
Phone Number: (705) 445-2281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLISON CATHERINE EDGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDGAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010