Edmonds, Marcia Lynn (CPSO#: 69693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room E1-102
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcia Edmonds Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Edmonds ( CPSO# 69693 )

Business Address:
LHSC
Room E1-102
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCIA LYNN EDMONDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDMONDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 20 Nov 1995 to 17 Dec 1995
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Apr 1996 to 05 May 1996
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2004