Edwards, Cedric Andrew (CPSO#: 71174)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-
Riverside Campus
5th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82563
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TOH-Civic Campus
E6
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 14946
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Queensway Carltron Hospital
Dialysis Unit
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 8500
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Hospital-General Campus
AKU-2nd Floor
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8194
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cedric Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tharson ( CPSO# 78938 )
Dr. C. Edwards ( CPSO# 71174 )

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CEDRIC ANDREW EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2001