Edwards, Lawrence Albert (CPSO#: 18284)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jan 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.A. Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 31 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1962
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jan 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 30, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lawrence Albert Edwards to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 15, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Edwards engaged in professional misconduct or was incompetent in his medical practice. During the investigation, Dr. Edwards resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)