Edwards, Michelle Diane (CPSO#: 94767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Center
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R1B5
Phone: 416-530-0630
Fax: 416-530-6107
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Medicine
McMaster University Medical Center
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 76992
Fax: 905-524-5500
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michelle Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 94767 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6084

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELLE DIANE EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 31 Jan 2011 to 20 Feb 2011
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2012