Ee, Mong Tieng (CPSO#: 99777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018

Expiry Date:  23 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PEAP - Resident as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Malaya, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C
Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Malaysia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONG TIENG EE may practise medicine only:

(a) in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the The University of Western Ontario to which the holder is appointed, and only as part of a system in which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the program to that clinical teaching unit;

(b) to the extent required to complete the Pre-entry Assessment Program to which the holder is appointed; and

(c) under a level of supervision that is determined to be appropriate for the holder and the program of medical education and assessment, by a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario designated by the director of the program.

(2) Dr. EE may not charge a fee for medical services.

(3) This certificate expires when Dr. EE is no longer enrolled in the Pre-entry Assessment Program specified in paragraph (1), which may be no more than twelve weeks in duration.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 Jul 2018 and expires on 23 Sep 2018, or when Dr. EE's enrolment in the Pre-entry Assessment Program ends, whichever occurs first.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 25 Mar 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 23 Sep 2018
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018