Efala, Khal Mabru (CPSO#: 80319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Nov 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: ElFallah, Khaled El-Mabruk Ali (used until: 29 Apr 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ground Floor 1
145 Front Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1E3
Phone: (416) 364-4052
Fax: (416) 364-4423
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khal Efala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Efala ( CPSO# 80319 )

Business Address:
145 Front Street East
Ground Floor 1
Toronto ON  M5A 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 364-4052


Corporation Name: Efala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mohapatra ( CPSO# 100565)
Dr. K. Efala ( CPSO# 80319 )

Business Address:
G1
145 Front Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 364-4052

Business Address:
Suite 105
1939 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 412-0505


Corporation Name: Subhra Mohapatra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. D'Souza ( CPSO# 100502)
Dr. S. Mohapatra ( CPSO# 100565)
Dr. K. Efala ( CPSO# 80319 )
Dr. M. D'Souza ( CPSO# 91147 )
Dr. H. Jeyaraj ( CPSO# 86403 )

Business Address:
Myo Medical MD
G1
145 Front Street East
Toronto ON  M5A 1E3
Phone Number: (416) 364-4052

Business Address:
Suite 105
1939 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 412-0505


Corporation Name: Dr. D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. D'Souza ( CPSO# 100502)
Dr. S. Mohapatra ( CPSO# 100565)
Dr. K. Efala ( CPSO# 80319 )
Dr. M. D'Souza ( CPSO# 91147 )

Business Address:
145 Front Street East
Ground Floor
Toronto ON  M5A 1E3
Phone Number: (647) 273-0124

Business Address:
MyomedicalMD
1939 Kennedy Road
Unit 105
Toronto ON  M1P 2L9
Phone Number: (416) 364-4052

Business Address:
Suite 100
111 Simcoe Street North
Oshawa ON  L1G 4S4
Phone Number: (437) 981-4629

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHAL MABRU EFALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EFALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 19 Dec 2003
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 20 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 21 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2004 to 21 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2005 to 21 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2006 to 21 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 22 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008