Eibisch, Larisa Ilona (CPSO#: 88807)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Hausmanis, Larisa Ilona (used until: 29 Sep 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Latvian, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sherbourne Health Centre
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone: (416) 324-4100
Fax: (416) 324-4181
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Coderix Medical Clinic
First Floor, 69 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 640-2384
Fax: 416 9818842
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Larisa Eibisch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Eibisch ( CPSO# 88807 )

Business Address:
Sherbourne Health Centre
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone Number: (416) 457-6971

Business Address:
101 - 69 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 640-2384

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARISA ILONA EIBISCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EIBISCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2010