Eid, Moustafa Reyad Ibrahim (CPSO#: 90712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Tanta University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Front Avenue W
Brockville ON  K6V 4J2
Phone: (613) 342-2262 Ext. 5362
Fax: (613) 342-2435
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Charles St
Brockville General Hospital
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Canada
Phone: (613) 345-5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moustafa Eid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 4 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOUSTAFA REYAD IBRAHIM EID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 19 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013