Eikelboom, John William Andrew (CPSO#: 73308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 11 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Western Australia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC General Hospital Campus
Thrombosis Service McMaster Clinic
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 40323
Fax: (905) 521-1551
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Eikelboom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Eikelboom ( CPSO# 73308 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 531-5969

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 03 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM ANDREW EIKELBOOM may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF MEDICINE, DIVISION OF HEMATOLOGY AND THROMBOEMBOLISM MCMASTER UNIVERSITY in which Dr. EIKELBOOM holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. EIKELBOOM may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. EIKELBOOM no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 01 Jul 2000
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2007