Eino, Dalia Mahmoud (CPSO#: 71448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
215 KING ST WEST
Dundas ON  L9H 2V1
Phone: (905) 627-4975
Fax: (905) 627-7553
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalia Eino Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Eino ( CPSO# 71448 )

Business Address:
215 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V6
Phone Number: (905) 627-4975

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALIA MAHMOUD EINO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EINO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2002