Eipe, Naveen (CPSO#: 85562)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Tamil Nadu Dr M G R Medical University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue Room B310
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13680
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

5 Hyde Park Way
Ottawa ON  K2G 5R8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Naveen Eipe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Eipe ( CPSO# 85562 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hosptial - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B310
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Sep 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 06 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 07 Oct 2006 to 30 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Oct 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Naveen Eipe may practise medicine independently in anaesthesiology.