Eisenstat, Lyon Jonathan (CPSO#: 64111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Fax: (905) 721-4547
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

49 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

222 King Street East #108
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYON JONATHAN EISENSTAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISENSTAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 04 Apr 2004
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1992