Ekhzaimy, Aishah Ali Mohamed Ahmed (CPSO#: 77256)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 31 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Apr 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2010