El Bayomy, Mohamed El Said Mohamed (CPSO#: 90408)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ain Shams University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2009 to 22 Jul 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 23 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 09 Feb 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Electrophysiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 2011