El Boreky, Fadia Refaat Ramzy (CPSO#: 90022)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
149 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone: (519) 569-8500
Fax: (519) 569-8506
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

911 Queens blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 591-6600
Fax: (519) 749-6700
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fadia El Boreky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. El Boreky ( CPSO# 90022 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
149 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 569-8500


Corporation Name: Sameh Fikry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. El Boreky ( CPSO# 90022 )
Dr. S. Fikry ( CPSO# 92534 )

Business Address:
121 Charles Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1H6
Phone Number: (519) 618-9260

Business Address:
149 Union Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 1C4
Phone Number: (519) 569-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FADIA REFAAT RAMZY EL BOREKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL BOREKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 20 Nov 2008 to 17 Dec 2008
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2009