El Faraidi, Huda Abdulhameed M (CPSO#: 96922)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012