El Ghamudi, Abdulhakim Amara A (CPSO#: 75698)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2333
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elghamudi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. El Ghamudi ( CPSO# 75698 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULHAKIM AMARA A EL GHAMUDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL GHAMUDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2000 to 25 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2001 to 25 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 25 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2003 to 25 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2008