El Hallani, Soufiane (CPSO#: 96398)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Université Cadi Ayyad, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016