El Keilani, Akram M I (CPSO#: 80658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette campus
1030 Ouellete Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444 Ext. 3579
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Met campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

194 Talbot St W
Leamington
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Canada
Phone: 15193262373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Akram El Keilani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. El Keilani ( CPSO# 80658 )

Business Address:
195 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 326-2373

Business Address:
Cancer Care Ontario
620 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2L7
Phone Number: (416) 971-9800

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AKRAM M I EL KEILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL KEILANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2004 to 23 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009