El Rayes, Maged Fouad Elias (CPSO#: 100368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C Victoria Hospital &
Children's Hospital
Department of Nuclear Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Maged Fouad Elias El Rayes may practise medicine only as required by
                  the clinical fellowship program in Nuclear Medicine in which Dr. El Rayes
                  is enrolled in the Department of Nuclear Medicine, University of Western
                  Ontario;

            2.    Dr. El Rayes shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients and out-patients
                  of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                  department where Dr. El Rayes is properly practising medicine and to
                  which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as
                  part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. El Rayes shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on June 30, 2019.