El Sayegh, Adil Yagoub Hussain (CPSO#: 80135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adil ElSayegh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. El Sayegh ( CPSO# 80135 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADIL YAGOUB HUSSAIN EL SAYEGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL SAYEGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Aug 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2004