El Serafi, Murad Mohamed (CPSO#: 90613)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2013