El Zaharna, Ramy Mohamed Rizk Saliem (CPSO#: 90465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Univerzita Komenskeho,Bratislava, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Z M C Medical Centre
Unit 2
1801 Harwood Avenue
Ajax ON  L1T 0K8
Phone: (905) 427-5444
Fax: (905) 427-6444
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramy El-Zaharna Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. El Zaharna ( CPSO# 90465 )

Business Address:
Z M C Medical Centre
Unit 2
1801 Harwood Avenue
Ajax ON  L1T 0K8
Phone Number: (905) 427-5444

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 May 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMY MOHAMED RIZK SALIEM EL ZAHARNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL ZAHARNA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2010