El-Brakey, Mary Refaat Ramzy (CPSO#: 80380)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2242
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Mary's General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6485
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary El-Brakey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Morgan ( CPSO# 82073 )
Dr. M. El-Brakey ( CPSO# 80380 )

Business Address:
Anesthesia Associates
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311


Corporation Name: Magid Morgan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Morgan ( CPSO# 82073 )
Dr. M. El-Brakey ( CPSO# 80380 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
PO Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6485

Business Address:
Anesthesia Associates
439 Park Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY REFAAT RAMZY EL-BRAKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-BRAKEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 27 Feb 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 28 Feb 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 28 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2008