El-Chaar, Darine Georges (CPSO#: 84231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Box 804
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8797
Fax: (613) 737-8070
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Chaar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. El-Chaar ( CPSO# 84231 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Box 804
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8797

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 08 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARINE GEORGES EL-CHAAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-CHAAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 12 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 21 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 22 Dec 2010 to 08 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 09 Jun 2011 to 08 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 09 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2014