El-Khuffash, Afif Faisal A (CPSO#: 91736)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Mar 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2012