El-Mallah, Medhat William Rezk Allah Hanna (CPSO#: 83047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Minya, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corp Oshawa Div
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 5441
Fax: (905) 721-6101
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Court
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 740-8326
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-7483
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. El-Mallah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. El-Mallah ( CPSO# 83047 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corp RS McLaughlin
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Oncology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 740-8326

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7483

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEDHAT WILLIAM REZK ALLAH HANNA EL-MALLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-MALLAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 23 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2008