El-Rayes, Malak (CPSO#: 88249)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 10 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 May 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2012