El-Sadi, Salman Abdel Khader Salman (CPSO#: 78473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Jordan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Sadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. El-Sadi ( CPSO# 78473 )

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALMAN ABDEL KHADER SALMAN EL-SADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SADI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2002