El-Salfiti, Ismail Kamal (CPSO#: 95191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Westend Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: (613) 599-3366
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-6133
Fax: (613) 258-1225
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ismail El-Salfiti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. I. El-Salfiti ( CPSO# 95191 )

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Business Address:
The Westend Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISMAIL KAMAL EL-SALFITI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SALFITI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013