El-Shahed, Amr Ibraheem El-Dosoky Mohamed (CPSO#: 83498)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Nov 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Mansoura University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neonatal Perinatal
Medicine
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6341
Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 13 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 03 Feb 2019
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Amr Ibraheem El-Dosoky Mohamed El-Shahed may practise medicine only
                  as required by the clinical fellowship program in neonatal-perinatal
                  medicine in which Dr. El-Shahed is enrolled in the Department of
                  Paediatrics, University of Toronto;

            2.    Dr. El-Shahed shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients and out-patients
                  of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                  department where Dr. El-Shahed is properly practising medicine and to
                  which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as
                  part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

            3.    Dr. El-Shahed shall not charge a fee for medical services; and

            4.    The certificate expires on June 30, 2019.