El-Tair, Mervat Mohamed Mostafa (CPSO#: 75752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:ZAGAZIG FACULTY OF MEDICINE, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone: (613) 692-2571
Fax: (613) 692-0271
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Sayed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. El-Tair ( CPSO# 75752 )
Dr. S. El-Sayed ( CPSO# 75443 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Business Address:
5230 Mitch Owens Road
PO Box 580
Manotick ON  K4M 1B2
Phone Number: (613) 692-2571

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
503 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MERVAT MOHAMED MOSTAFA EL-TAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-TAIR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2000
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2001