El-Tatari, Bassam Mohamed Khalil Darwish (CPSO#: 88100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Czech, English

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Walkerville Medical Centre
328-2224 Walker Rd
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 946-0705
Fax: (519) 946-3265
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bassam El-Tatari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. El-Tatari ( CPSO# 88100 )

Business Address:
Suite 328
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 946-0705

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Feb 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 02 Jun 2017

Pending Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. El-Tatari’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. El-Tatari engaged in sexual abuse and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including; by touching patients in an inappropriate and/or sexual manner; by making inappropriate and/or sexual comments and gestures to patients; by proceeding with patient encounters without proper explanation or consent; by failing to provide appropriate privacy to patients; in dealing with inquiries about a chaperone for a patient; by failing to comply with a police request/warrant for a patient’s medical record, and inappropriately adding and removing information from a patient’s medical record.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Hearing Date(s): Hearing dates: March 4-8, March 25-29, April 8-12, 2019 Motion date: 3rd Party Records Motion - December 5, 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 02 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 2, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Bassam Mohamed Khalil
            Darwish El-Tatari, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            El-Tatari to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                              DR. BASSAM MOHAMED KHALIL DARWISH EL-TATARI
                                           ("Dr. El-Tatari")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, certificate of registration number 88100, am a member
                  of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that the College has referred to the
                  Discipline Committee, allegations that I engaged in sexual abuse and
                  disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including; by
                  touching patients in an inappropriate and/or sexual manner; by making
                  inappropriate and/or sexual comments and gestures to patients; by
                  proceeding with patient encounters without proper explanation or consent;
                  by failing to provide appropriate privacy to patients; in dealing with
                  inquiries about a chaperone for a patient; by failing to comply with a
                  police request/warrant for a patient's medical record, and
                  inappropriately adding and removing information from a patient's medical
                  record.  

            (4)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, have read the Notice of Hearing dated May 2, 2017,
                  which sets out the allegations against me.  I am aware of the College's
                  concern about protecting the public and I understand the nature of the
                  allegations against me.

            (5)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that the College has accepted this
                  Undertaking in lieu of making an Order under section 25.4 of the Code.

            (6)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that this Undertaking continues in force
                  until the matters currently referred are disposed of by a panel of the
                  Discipline Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (8)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake that I shall not engage in any
                        professional encounters of any kind, in person or otherwise
                        ("Patient Encounter(s)"), with patients, unless the Patient
                        Encounter takes place in the continuous presence of and under the
                        continuous observation of a monitor who is a regulated health
                        professional acceptable to the College (the "Practice Monitor"),
                        and unless the other requirements provided in the Undertaking are
                        fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. El-Tatari may not be alone with
                        any patient, for any length of time, during any patient encounter
                        of any kind.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Practice
                        Monitor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A" and
                        understand what is required of the Practice Monitor. I shall ensure
                        that the Practice Monitor complies with his or her duties, which
                        include, but are not limited to: 
                  
                        1.    providing reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                              undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                        2.    remaining present at all times during all Professional
                              Encounters even if another person is accompanying the
                              patient; 
                  
                        3.    carefully observing all of my Patient Encounters, including
                              but not limited to physical examinations.  I further
                              acknowledge my obligation to ensure the Practice Monitor's
                              view of all of my Patient Encounters, including physical and
                              internal examinations, is unobstructed at all times; 
                  
                        4.    refraining from performing any other functions, except those
                              required in the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as
                              Appendix "A",  while observing all my Patient Encounters; 
                  
                        5.    maintaining an up-to-date log of all Patient Encounters in
                              the form attached to this Undertaking as Appendix "B" (the
                              "Log") which shall list every patient seen in my family
                              practice, including the patient's name, date of birth, OHIP
                              number, date of appointment or visit, reason for visit, and
                              whether any breast, genital or rectal examinations
                              (collectively referred to as "Intimate Examination(s)") were
                              conducted and the indication for the examination.;
                  
                        6.    initialing all corresponding entries in the records of
                              patients noted in the Log; and
                  
                        7.    submitting the original Log to the College on a monthly
                              basis.
                  
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                  location that I practise or have privileges including, but not limited
                  to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                  (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of
                  executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform
                  the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.

            (10)  Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall
                        post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting
                        rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out in Appendix "C" that states:
                        "Dr. Bassam Mohamed Khalil Darwish El-Tatari must not have any
                        professional encounters with any patients, unless in the continuous
                        presence of and under the continuous observation of a practice
                        monitor acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                        Ontario. Dr. Bassam Mohamed Khalil Darwish El-Tatari must not be
                        alone with any patients in any examination or consulting room.
                        Further information may be found on the College website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca" 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in
                        any language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described
                        in section (10)(a), in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                        consulting rooms, in all of my Practice Locations, in a clearly
                        visible and secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "C."
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (10)(b), to the College within thirty (30)
                        days of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
            (e)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                  translation(s) described in section (10)(b) prior to providing services
                  in the language(s) described in section (10)(d).

            (11)  Notifying Patients 

                  (a)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake to ensure that each patient scheduled
                        for an appointment with me is directly notified, prior to the
                        appointment, of the details of the restriction described in section
                        (8)(a). 
                  
                  (b)   If the appointment referred to in section (11)(a) above is
                        scheduled to take place more than seven (7) days after the date on
                        which it is booked, I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake to ensure that each
                        patient scheduled for an appointment with me is directly notified,
                        when the appointment is booked, of the details of the restriction
                        described in section (8)(a).
                  
            (12)  Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), in respect of all Intimate Examinations in my
                        family medicine practice.  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "D", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). I shall
                        ensure that the Clinical Supervisor complies with his or her duties
                        which include, at minimum, that he or she: 
                  
                        (i)   Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (ii)  Review the Log and, in respect of all Intimate Examinations,
                              examine the relevant patient charts to confirm that any
                              Intimate Examination conducted was indicated and appropriate.
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (v)   Submit written reports to the College at least once a month
                              or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns
                              about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my Intimate Examinations in my family medicine
                        practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix
                        "D" attached, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical
                        Supervisor.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake to ensure that Appendix "D" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within ten (10)
                        days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "D" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        thirty (30) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections
                        (12)(d) and/or (e) above, I will cease practising medicine until
                        such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to
                        the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (12)(f) above this will constitute
                        a term, condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration
                        and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the
                        public register.
                  
            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Dr. El-Tatari is the subject of a referral to the Discipline
                              Committee into allegations of sexual abuse and disgraceful,
                              dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. As a result of the
                              referral:
                  
                              *     Dr. El-Tatari must not have any professional encounters
                                    with any patients, unless in the continuous presence of
                                    and under the continuous observation of a practice
                                    monitor. Dr. El-Tatari must not be alone with any
                                    patients in any examination or consulting room.
                              *     Dr. El-Tatari must practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College in
                                    respect of intimate examinations. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (14)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
            (15)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (16)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that a breach of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and may
                  result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (17)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (18)  In the event of an appeal of any order of the Discipline Committee, I,
                  Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that if the Discipline Committee has directed
                  the Registrar to revoke, suspend, or impose terms and conditions on my
                  certificate of registration, that order will take effect immediately
                  despite any appeal.

            (19)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (20)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            D.    CONSENT

            (22)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (23)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "E". 

            (24)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to all Clinical Supervisors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                  this Undertaking.
                  
            (25)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (26)  I, Dr. El-Tatari, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors
                  and Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "D"; and/or
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking. 

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: June 4, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective May 29, 2015, where a member has been charged with an offence under the Criminal Code of Canada or the Ontario Health Insurance Act and the charge is outstanding and is known to the College, the College By-laws require certain information about the charge to be posted on the register.

The following are outstanding charges against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:

(1) 8 counts of Sexual Assault against 8 persons at the City of Windsor at various times between January 1, 2009 and December 31, 2015 contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code.

Date of charges: February 18, 2016 and May 18, 2018
Place of charges: Windsor, Ontario
Windsor Police Service


Source: Other
Active Date: June 4, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 4, 2014, the College By-laws require members to report to the College any currently existing conditions of release (“bail conditions”) following a charge for a criminal or provincial offence or subsequent to a finding of guilt and pending appeal. The following are conditions of release made against this member:

[May 18, 2018]

1. Do not associate or communicate in any way either directly or indirectly, by any physical, electronic or other means, with the named person(s).

2. Do not be within 25 metres of any place where he knows the named person(s) to live, work, attend school.


Source: Member
Active Date: June 2, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bassam Mohamed Khalil Darwish El-Tatari to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 2, 2017:
Dr. El-Tatari is the subject of a referral to the Discipline Committee into allegations of sexual abuse and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. As a result of the referral:
• Dr. El-Tatari must not have any professional encounters with any patients, unless in the continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor. Dr. El-Tatari must not be alone with any patients in any examination or consulting room.
• Dr. El-Tatari must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College in respect of intimate examinations.