ElTobgy, Kamal Eldin Mohamed Asaad (CPSO#: 89645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Milton Kids Clinic
604 Santa Maria Blvd.
Building C, unit 1
Milton ON  L9T 9L7
Phone: (905) 878-0055
Fax: (905) 878-0544
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Living Arts Medical Centre
Unit 2
4100 Living Arts Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 0C3
Canada
Phone: (905) 270-5600
Fax: (905) 270-8830
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ElTobgy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. ElTobgy ( CPSO# 89645 )

Business Address:
Halton Health Care Services
Milton District Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
7030 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 7H6
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
101 - 450 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone Number: (905) 878-9720

Business Address:
2 - 4100 Living Arts Drive
Mississauga ON  L5B 0C3
Phone Number: (905) 270-5600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMAL ELDIN MOHAMED ASAAD ELTOBGY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELTOBGY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2008 to 08 Oct 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013