El-Zein, Mohamad Abdul Karim (CPSO#: 92479)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of Beirut, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Lebanon

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 22 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Aug 2012 to 05 Nov 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Nov 2015
Clinical Fellow - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Nov 2015