Elahi, Mohammed Mehboob (CPSO#: 72950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Shops at Don Mills
Suite 204
6 Maginn Mews
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Phone: (416) 221-2441
Fax: (416) 221-3550
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elahi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Elahi ( CPSO# 72950 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
6 Maginn Mews
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Phone Number: (416) 221-2441

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED MEHBOOB ELAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELAHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1998