Elahi, Sofia Iqbal Baig (CPSO#: 85212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2304 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M9W 3W9
Phone: (647) 348-0588
Fax: (647) 348-5807
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sofia B. Elahi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elahi ( CPSO# 85212 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
2304 Islington Avenue
Toronto ON  M9W 3W9
Phone Number: (647) 348-0588

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jan 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOFIA IQBAL BAIG ELAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELAHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2008