Elashaal, Abdelrahman Abdallah Baraka (CPSO#: 78151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13278 tecumseh r east
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdelrahman Elashaal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elashaal ( CPSO# 78151 )

Business Address:
Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 254-5763

Business Address:
Suite 205
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 254-5763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDELRAHMAN ABDALLAH BARAKA ELASHAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELASHAAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2007