Elashaal, Abdurrahim Abdalla (CPSO#: 87504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: 5199734690
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 205
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-8771
Fax: 5199734690
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Leamington District memorial Hospit
Neurosurgery
194 Talbot street West
Leamington
Leamington ON  N9H 1N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 326-2373
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdurrahim Elashaal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Elashaal ( CPSO# 87504 )

Business Address:
Leamington District Memorial Hospital
194 Talbot Street West
Leamington ON  N8H 1N9
Phone Number: (519) 322-2501

Business Address:
Suite 205
1106 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 973-8771

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 05 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDURRAHIM ABDALLA ELASHAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELASHAAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2012