Elattar, Hussein Amin Hussein Mohamed (CPSO#: 111816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 12 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 596-4200
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt
USA - New York

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUSSEIN AMIN HUSSEIN MOHAMED ELATTAR shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ELATTAR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ELATTAR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ELATTAR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ELATTAR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ELATTAR is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ELATTAR no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 11 Aug 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 12 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019