Elbarouni, Basem Abulgasem Omar Naama (CPSO#: 82260)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elbarouni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 6 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Mar 2005 to 29 May 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 May 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 May 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014