Elfakhani, Mohamad (CPSO#: 93505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Elfakhani, Mohamad Said (used until: 25 Aug 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of Beirut, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
North Tower Room B8-140
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 57131
Fax: 519-667-6564
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Elfakhani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Elfakhani ( CPSO# 93505 )

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
North Tower Room B8 114
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMAD ELFAKHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELFAKHANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015