Elfar, Ayman (CPSO#: 78374)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Sep 2003 to 31 May 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2004