Elfiki, Tarek A (CPSO#: 85556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Arab Medical University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. TA Elfiki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Elfiki ( CPSO# 85556 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON  N8W 2X3
Phone Number: (519) 566-2925

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland
Libya

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 11 Aug 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2006 to 12 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 11 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 Feb 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Feb 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Tarek  A.  Elfiki may practise medicine independently in Medical Oncology,
            only.