Elghobary, Tamer (CPSO#: 97264)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tamer Elghobary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 21 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016