Elhenawy, Abdelsalam Mohamed Abdelsalam (CPSO#: 83446)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Elhenawy, Abdel Salam Mohamed Abdel Salam (used until: 14 Mar 2010 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Al-Azhar University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009