Elimova, Elena (CPSO#: 88967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
0PG 7-715
610 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 416-946-4501 Ext. 2520
Fax: 416-946-6546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elena Elimova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elimova ( CPSO# 88967 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
0PG - 7-715
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELENA ELIMOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIMOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012